Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1805 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 30, 2023
Bill January 30, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill March 22, 2023
Analysis March 22, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill April 12, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 22, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 22, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 21, 2023
Fiscal Note March 12, 2023