House | 05/15/2023 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/12/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/12/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4317 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2907 | |
House | 03/07/2023 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 506 | |
House | 03/07/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 506 | |
House | 02/03/2023 | Filed |