Senate | 05/05/2023 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1600 | |
Senate | 05/05/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1600 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1496 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2915 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2678 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Record vote | RV#838 | Journal Page: 2677 |
House | 05/02/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 2677 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2677 | |
House | 05/01/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2538 | |
House | 05/01/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2538 | |
House | 05/01/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1793 | |
House | 04/05/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1600 | |
House | 03/07/2023 | Referred to Corrections | Journal Page: 508 | |
House | 02/03/2023 | Filed |