Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1888 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 3, 2023
Bill February 3, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 17, 2023
Analysis April 17, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill April 21, 2023
Bill April 21, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 17, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 17, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 10, 2023
Fiscal Note March 20, 2023