Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1911 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 3, 2023
Bill February 3, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 19, 2023
Analysis April 19, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Analysis May 10, 2023
Bill April 28, 2023
Bill April 28, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 16, 2023
Witness List

Enrolled

Bill May 19, 2023
Bill May 19, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 16, 2023
Bill April 19, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 10, 2023
Analysis April 19, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 10, 2023
Fiscal Note April 17, 2023
Fiscal Note April 11, 2023