Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1993 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 7, 2023
Bill February 7, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 14, 2023
Analysis April 13, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Bill April 20, 2023
Bill April 20, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 14, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 13, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 3, 2023