E
|
06/12/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
06/12/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6491
|
E
|
05/26/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5975
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2994
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5615
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5620
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5289
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2551
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2551
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2551
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2550
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2539
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2402
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2402
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2402
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2138
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1781
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1781
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1702
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3859
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3539
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1317
|
Journal Page: 3539
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3539
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3539
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3400
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1273
|
Journal Page: 3399
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3399
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3399
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2578
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1781
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 556
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|