Senate | 04/24/2023 | Referred to s/c on Higher Education by Pres | Journal Page: 1234 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1234 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1199 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1841 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1736 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Record vote | RV#345 | Journal Page: 1736 |
House | 04/20/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1736 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1736 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1728 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1728 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1395 | |
House | 04/05/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1234 | |
House | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 558 | |
House | 02/09/2023 | Filed |