Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2157 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 10, 2023
Bill February 10, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 10, 2023
Analysis April 10, 2023

Engrossed

Analysis May 10, 2023
Bill April 20, 2023
Bill April 20, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 16, 2023
Witness List

Enrolled

Bill May 19, 2023
Bill May 19, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 16, 2023
Bill April 10, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 10, 2023
Analysis April 10, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 10, 2023
Fiscal Note March 27, 2023