Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2181 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 10, 2023
Bill February 10, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 3, 2023
Analysis May 2, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Analysis May 19, 2023
Bill May 10, 2023
Bill May 10, 2023
Fiscal Note

Analysis

Analysis May 19, 2023
Analysis May 2, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 19, 2023
Fiscal Note May 1, 2023
Fiscal Note April 17, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 3, 2023