Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2232 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2023
Bill February 13, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 2, 2023
Analysis May 1, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Analysis May 20, 2023
Bill May 7, 2023
Bill May 7, 2023
Fiscal Note

Analysis

Analysis May 20, 2023
Analysis May 1, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 20, 2023
Fiscal Note April 25, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 2, 2023