Senate | 04/20/2023 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1193 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1193 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1036 | |
House | 04/18/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1709 | |
House | 04/18/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1564 | |
House | 04/18/2023 | Record vote | RV#255 | Journal Page: 1563 |
House | 04/18/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1563 | |
House | 04/18/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1563 | |
House | 04/17/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1525 | |
House | 04/17/2023 | Record vote | RV#227 | Journal Page: 1524 |
House | 04/17/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1524 | |
House | 04/17/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1524 | |
House | 04/17/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 987 | |
House | 03/28/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1193 | |
House | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 567 | |
House | 02/13/2023 | Filed |