Senate | 04/24/2023 | Referred to Local Government | Journal Page: 1234 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1234 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1200 | |
House | 04/21/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1929 | |
House | 04/21/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1810 | |
House | 04/21/2023 | Record vote | RV#399 | Journal Page: 1809 |
House | 04/21/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1809 | |
House | 04/21/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1809 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1772 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Record vote | RV#380 | Journal Page: 1772 |
House | 04/20/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1772 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1772 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1344 | |
House | 03/30/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1234 | |
House | 03/09/2023 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 572 | |
House | 02/14/2023 | Filed |