Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2328 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2023
Bill February 14, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 20, 2023
Analysis April 19, 2023
Fiscal Note
Witness List

Comm Sub

Bill April 20, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 19, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 13, 2023
Fiscal Note April 10, 2023