Senate | 05/15/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1920 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1920 | |
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1548 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3075 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2819 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Record vote | RV#930 | Journal Page: 2818 |
House | 05/03/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 2818 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2818 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2752 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Record vote | RV#890 | Journal Page: 2751 |
House | 05/02/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2751 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2751 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1395 | |
House | 04/04/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1920 | |
House | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 576 | |
House | 02/15/2023 | Filed |