Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2414 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2023
Bill February 16, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 21, 2023
Analysis April 20, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Analysis May 18, 2023
Bill May 2, 2023
Bill May 2, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 21, 2023
Witness List

Comm Sub

Bill May 21, 2023
Bill April 21, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 19, 2023
Fiscal Note April 18, 2023
Fiscal Note April 3, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 19, 2023
Analysis April 20, 2023