Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2414 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 05/21/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Frank (Senate Sponsor - Hancock) H.B. No. 2414
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2023;
 May 12, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
 Human Services; May 21, 2023, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0, one present not voting; May 21, 2023, sent to
 printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain practices of a health maintenance organization
 or insurer to encourage the use of certain physicians and health
 care providers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter I, Chapter 843, Insurance Code, is
 amended by adding Section 843.322 to read as follows:
 Sec. 843.322.  INCENTIVES TO USE CERTAIN PHYSICIANS OR
 PROVIDERS. (a)  A health maintenance organization may provide
 incentives for enrollees to use certain physicians or providers
 through modified deductibles, copayments, coinsurance, or other
 cost-sharing provisions.
 (b)  A health maintenance organization that encourages an
 enrollee to obtain a health care service from a particular
 physician or provider, including offering incentives to encourage
 enrollees to use specific physicians or providers, or that
 introduces or modifies a tiered network plan or assigns physicians
 or providers into tiers, has a fiduciary duty to the enrollee or
 group contract holder to engage in that conduct only for the primary
 benefit of the enrollee or group contract holder.
 SECTION 2.  Section 1301.0045(a), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by Sections [Section] 1301.0046 and
 1301.0047, this chapter may not be construed to limit the level of
 reimbursement or the level of coverage, including deductibles,
 copayments, coinsurance, or other cost-sharing provisions, that
 are applicable to preferred providers or, for plans other than
 exclusive provider benefit plans, nonpreferred providers.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter A, Chapter 1301, Insurance Code, is
 amended by adding Section 1301.0047 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1301.0047.  INCENTIVES TO USE CERTAIN PHYSICIANS OR
 HEALTH CARE PROVIDERS. (a)  An insurer may provide incentives for
 insureds to use certain physicians or health care providers through
 modified deductibles, copayments, coinsurance, or other
 cost-sharing provisions.
 (b)  An insurer that encourages an insured to obtain a health
 care service from a particular physician or health care provider,
 including offering incentives to encourage insureds to use specific
 physicians or providers, or that introduces or modifies a tiered
 network plan or assigns physicians or providers into tiers, has a
 fiduciary duty to the insured or policyholder to engage in that
 conduct only for the primary benefit of the insured or
 policyholder.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *