Senate | 05/19/2023 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2235 | |
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Reported from s/c with no recommendation | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Considered by subcommittee | ||
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Referred to s/c on Higher Education by Pres | Journal Page: 1782 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1782 | |
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1703 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3859 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3551 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Record vote | RV#1327 | Journal Page: 3550 |
House | 05/09/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 3550 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3550 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3405 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3405 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1395 | |
House | 04/05/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1782 | |
House | 03/13/2023 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 592 | |
House | 02/16/2023 | Filed |