Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2469 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2023
Bill February 17, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 10, 2023
Analysis April 10, 2023

Engrossed

Analysis May 2, 2023
Bill April 20, 2023
Bill April 20, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 10, 2023
Witness List

Comm Sub

Bill May 10, 2023
Bill April 10, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 2, 2023
Analysis April 10, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 2, 2023
Fiscal Note March 28, 2023