E | 06/12/2023 | Effective on 9/1/23 | ||
E | 06/12/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6491 | |
E | 05/22/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5143 | |
Senate | 05/21/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2291 | |
House | 05/19/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4826 | |
House | 05/18/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4835 | |
House | 05/17/2023 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4559 | |
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1994 | |
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1994 | |
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1994 | |
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1994 | |
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1994 | |
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1994 | |
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1994 | |
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1596 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development | Journal Page: 1090 | |
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1090 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 975 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1530 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1477 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Record vote | RV#199 | Journal Page: 1477 |
House | 04/14/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1477 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1477 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1464 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1464 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 975 | |
House | 03/23/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1090 | |
House | 03/13/2023 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 598 | |
House | 02/17/2023 | Filed |