Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2503 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2023
Bill February 17, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 24, 2023
Analysis April 21, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Analysis May 12, 2023
Bill May 2, 2023
Bill May 2, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 17, 2023
Witness List

Enrolled

Bill May 22, 2023
Bill May 22, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2023
Bill April 24, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 12, 2023
Analysis April 21, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 11, 2023
Fiscal Note April 17, 2023
Fiscal Note March 30, 2023