Senate | 05/11/2023 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1782 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1782 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1757 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4049 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3751 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Record vote | RV#1425 | Journal Page: 3751 |
House | 05/10/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 3751 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3750 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3643 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Record vote | RV#1391 | Journal Page: 3642 |
House | 05/09/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3642 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3642 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Postponed | 5/9/23 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 3342 |
House | 05/06/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3342 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2578 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1782 | |
House | 03/13/2023 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 602 | |
House | 02/21/2023 | Filed |