Senate | 05/24/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2428 | |
Senate | 05/21/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/21/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/21/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Referred to Local Government | Journal Page: 1742 | |
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1742 | |
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1660 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3714 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3367 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Record vote | RV#1252 | Journal Page: 3367 |
House | 05/08/2023 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 3367 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Amended | 1-Leo-Wilson | Journal Page: 3366 |
House | 05/08/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3366 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3335 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Record vote | RV#1232 | Journal Page: 3335 |
House | 05/06/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3335 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3335 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1841 | |
House | 04/12/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1742 | |
House | 03/13/2023 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 602 | |
House | 02/21/2023 | Filed |