Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2542 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2023
Bill February 21, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 20, 2023
Analysis April 20, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Analysis May 20, 2023
Bill May 8, 2023
Bill May 8, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 22, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2023
Bill April 20, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 20, 2023
Analysis April 20, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 20, 2023
Fiscal Note April 12, 2023
Fiscal Note April 5, 2023