Senate | 05/24/2023 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/21/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/21/2023 | Co-sponsor authorized | Journal Page: 2322 | |
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 2241 | |
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development | Journal Page: 1233 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1233 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1196 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1841 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1760 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Record vote | RV#371 | Journal Page: 1760 |
House | 04/20/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1760 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1760 | |
House | 04/19/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1703 | |
House | 04/19/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1703 | |
House | 04/19/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1529 | |
House | 04/04/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1233 | |
House | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Environmental Regulation | Journal Page: 290 | |
House | 11/14/2022 | Filed |