Senate | 05/09/2023 | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development | Journal Page: 1691 | |
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1691 | |
Senate | 05/05/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1604 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3211 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2935 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Record vote | RV#1005 | Journal Page: 2934 |
House | 05/04/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 2934 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2934 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2864 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Record vote | RV#967 | Journal Page: 2863 |
House | 05/03/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2863 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2863 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2578 | |
House | 04/17/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1691 | |
House | 03/13/2023 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 608 | |
House | 02/22/2023 | Filed |