1 | 1 | | H.B. No. 2620 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to the confinement in a county jail of a person pending a |
---|
6 | 6 | | transfer to the Texas Department of Criminal Justice and to |
---|
7 | 7 | | compensation to a county for certain costs of confinement. |
---|
8 | 8 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 9 | | SECTION 1. Section 499.071, Government Code, is amended to |
---|
10 | 10 | | read as follows: |
---|
11 | 11 | | Sec. 499.071. SCHEDULED ADMISSIONS POLICY. The board shall |
---|
12 | 12 | | adopt and enforce a scheduled admissions policy that requires |
---|
13 | 13 | | [permits] the department [institutional division] to: |
---|
14 | 14 | | (1) review documents received under Section 8(a) or |
---|
15 | 15 | | (c), Article 42.09, Code of Criminal Procedure, and certify the |
---|
16 | 16 | | documents or notify the county that the documents require |
---|
17 | 17 | | corrective action within the time period required by Section 8(b) |
---|
18 | 18 | | of that article; and |
---|
19 | 19 | | (2) accept persons [inmates] within the time period |
---|
20 | 20 | | [45 days of processing as] required by Section 499.1215(b) |
---|
21 | 21 | | [499.121(c)]. |
---|
22 | 22 | | SECTION 2. Subchapter F, Chapter 499, Government Code, is |
---|
23 | 23 | | amended by adding Section 499.1215 to read as follows: |
---|
24 | 24 | | Sec. 499.1215. TRANSFER TO DEPARTMENT; COMPENSATION TO |
---|
25 | 25 | | COUNTIES. (a) In this section, "cost of confinement" means the |
---|
26 | 26 | | amount that would have been incurred by the department to confine a |
---|
27 | 27 | | person. The term does not include costs for medical, behavioral, or |
---|
28 | 28 | | pharmaceutical care. |
---|
29 | 29 | | (b) The department shall take custody of a person awaiting |
---|
30 | 30 | | transfer to the department following conviction of a felony and |
---|
31 | 31 | | sentencing to death or to a term of imprisonment in the department |
---|
32 | 32 | | or confinement in a state jail not later than the 45th day following |
---|
33 | 33 | | the date on which all documents required by Sections 8(a) and (c), |
---|
34 | 34 | | Article 42.09, Code of Criminal Procedure, have been certified as |
---|
35 | 35 | | required by Section 8(b) of that article. |
---|
36 | 36 | | (c) If the department does not take custody of a person |
---|
37 | 37 | | within the period prescribed by Subsection (b), the department |
---|
38 | 38 | | shall compensate the county for the cost of confinement for each day |
---|
39 | 39 | | the person remains confined in the county jail following the |
---|
40 | 40 | | expiration of that period. |
---|
41 | 41 | | (d) If a person remains confined in the county jail |
---|
42 | 42 | | following the expiration of the period prescribed by Subsection (b) |
---|
43 | 43 | | due to a delay caused by the county: |
---|
44 | 44 | | (1) the county is not entitled to compensation under |
---|
45 | 45 | | Subsection (c) for any day that the person remains confined due to |
---|
46 | 46 | | the delay caused by the county; and |
---|
47 | 47 | | (2) the county and the department shall arrange to |
---|
48 | 48 | | transfer the person to the department as soon as practicable after |
---|
49 | 49 | | the delay. |
---|
50 | 50 | | SECTION 3. Section 8, Article 42.09, Code of Criminal |
---|
51 | 51 | | Procedure, is amended by amending Subsection (b) and adding |
---|
52 | 52 | | Subsection (b-1) to read as follows: |
---|
53 | 53 | | (b) The Texas Department of Criminal Justice shall not take |
---|
54 | 54 | | a defendant into custody under this article until the designated |
---|
55 | 55 | | officer receives the documents required by Subsections (a) and (c) |
---|
56 | 56 | | of this section and determines that the documents do not contain any |
---|
57 | 57 | | errors or deficiencies requiring corrective action by the county. |
---|
58 | 58 | | Not later than the fifth business day after the date of receipt of |
---|
59 | 59 | | [The designated officer shall certify under the seal of the |
---|
60 | 60 | | department] the documents, the designated officer shall: |
---|
61 | 61 | | (1) certify the documents under the seal of the |
---|
62 | 62 | | department if the designated officer determines the documents do |
---|
63 | 63 | | not require any corrective action; or |
---|
64 | 64 | | (2) notify the county that the designated officer has |
---|
65 | 65 | | determined that the documents require corrective action [received |
---|
66 | 66 | | under Subsections (a) and (c) of this section]. |
---|
67 | 67 | | (b-1) A document certified under Subsection (b) [this |
---|
68 | 68 | | subsection] is self-authenticated for the purposes of Rules 901 and |
---|
69 | 69 | | 902, Texas Rules of Evidence. |
---|
70 | 70 | | SECTION 4. Section 499.121(c), Government Code, is |
---|
71 | 71 | | repealed. |
---|
72 | 72 | | SECTION 5. Not later than September 30, 2023, the Texas |
---|
73 | 73 | | Board of Criminal Justice shall adopt the scheduled admissions |
---|
74 | 74 | | policy required by Section 499.071, Government Code, as amended by |
---|
75 | 75 | | this Act. |
---|
76 | 76 | | SECTION 6. Section 499.1215, Government Code, as added by |
---|
77 | 77 | | this Act, applies only to compensation to a county for the costs |
---|
78 | 78 | | described by that section related to the confinement of a person |
---|
79 | 79 | | that occurs on or after October 1, 2023, regardless of whether the |
---|
80 | 80 | | requirements under that section for transfer of the person to the |
---|
81 | 81 | | Texas Department of Criminal Justice are completed before, on, or |
---|
82 | 82 | | after that date. |
---|
83 | 83 | | SECTION 7. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
84 | 84 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
85 | 85 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
86 | 86 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
87 | 87 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2023. |
---|
88 | 88 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
89 | 89 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
90 | 90 | | I certify that H.B. No. 2620 was passed by the House on April |
---|
91 | 91 | | 21, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 139, Nays 0, 1 present, not |
---|
92 | 92 | | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
93 | 93 | | No. 2620 on May 25, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 0, |
---|
94 | 94 | | 2 present, not voting. |
---|
95 | 95 | | ______________________________ |
---|
96 | 96 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
97 | 97 | | I certify that H.B. No. 2620 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
98 | 98 | | amendments, on May 21, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
99 | 99 | | 0. |
---|
100 | 100 | | ______________________________ |
---|
101 | 101 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
102 | 102 | | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
103 | 103 | | Date |
---|
104 | 104 | | __________________ |
---|
105 | 105 | | Governor |
---|