Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2620 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/26/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.B. No. 2620


 AN ACT
 relating to the confinement in a county jail of a person pending a
 transfer to the Texas Department of Criminal Justice and to
 compensation to a county for certain costs of confinement.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 499.071, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 499.071.  SCHEDULED ADMISSIONS POLICY. The board shall
 adopt and enforce a scheduled admissions policy that requires
 [permits] the department [institutional division] to:
 (1)  review documents received under Section 8(a) or
 (c), Article 42.09, Code of Criminal Procedure, and certify the
 documents or notify the county that the documents require
 corrective action within the time period required by Section 8(b)
 of that article; and
 (2)  accept persons [inmates] within the time period
 [45 days of processing as] required by Section 499.1215(b)
 [499.121(c)].
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter F, Chapter 499, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 499.1215 to read as follows:
 Sec. 499.1215.  TRANSFER TO DEPARTMENT; COMPENSATION TO
 COUNTIES. (a) In this section, "cost of confinement" means the
 amount that would have been incurred by the department to confine a
 person.  The term does not include costs for medical, behavioral, or
 pharmaceutical care.
 (b)  The department shall take custody of a person awaiting
 transfer to the department following conviction of a felony and
 sentencing to death or to a term of imprisonment in the department
 or confinement in a state jail not later than the 45th day following
 the date on which all documents required by Sections 8(a) and (c),
 Article 42.09, Code of Criminal Procedure, have been certified as
 required by Section 8(b) of that article.
 (c)  If the department does not take custody of a person
 within the period prescribed by Subsection (b), the department
 shall compensate the county for the cost of confinement for each day
 the person remains confined in the county jail following the
 expiration of that period.
 (d)  If a person remains confined in the county jail
 following the expiration of the period prescribed by Subsection (b)
 due to a delay caused by the county:
 (1)  the county is not entitled to compensation under
 Subsection (c) for any day that the person remains confined due to
 the delay caused by the county; and
 (2)  the county and the department shall arrange to
 transfer the person to the department as soon as practicable after
 the delay.
 SECTION 3.  Section 8, Article 42.09, Code of Criminal
 Procedure, is amended by amending Subsection (b) and adding
 Subsection (b-1) to read as follows:
 (b)  The Texas Department of Criminal Justice shall not take
 a defendant into custody under this article until the designated
 officer receives the documents required by Subsections (a) and (c)
 of this section and determines that the documents do not contain any
 errors or deficiencies requiring corrective action by the county.
 Not later than the fifth business day after the date of receipt of
 [The designated officer shall certify under the seal of the
 department] the documents, the designated officer shall:
 (1)  certify the documents under the seal of the
 department if the designated officer determines the documents do
 not require any corrective action; or
 (2)  notify the county that the designated officer has
 determined that the documents require corrective action [received
 under Subsections (a) and (c) of this section].
 (b-1)  A document certified under Subsection (b) [this
 subsection] is self-authenticated for the purposes of Rules 901 and
 902, Texas Rules of Evidence.
 SECTION 4.  Section 499.121(c), Government Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 5.  Not later than September 30, 2023, the Texas
 Board of Criminal Justice shall adopt the scheduled admissions
 policy required by Section 499.071, Government Code, as amended by
 this Act.
 SECTION 6.  Section 499.1215, Government Code, as added by
 this Act, applies only to compensation to a county for the costs
 described by that section related to the confinement of a person
 that occurs on or after October 1, 2023, regardless of whether the
 requirements under that section for transfer of the person to the
 Texas Department of Criminal Justice are completed before, on, or
 after that date.
 SECTION 7.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2620 was passed by the House on April
 21, 2023, by the following vote:  Yeas 139, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 2620 on May 25, 2023, by the following vote:  Yeas 143, Nays 0,
 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2620 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 21, 2023, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor