Senate | 05/17/2023 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 2058 | |
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2058 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1865 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4317 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4104 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Record vote | RV#1582 | Journal Page: 4104 |
House | 05/12/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 4104 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4103 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3963 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Amended | 1-Patterson | Journal Page: 3963 |
House | 05/11/2023 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3963 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Postponed | 5/11/23 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 3768 |
House | 05/10/2023 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3767 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Postponed | 5/10 23 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 3405 |
House | 05/08/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3405 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2342 | |
House | 04/13/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2058 | |
House | 03/13/2023 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | Journal Page: 611 | |
House | 02/22/2023 | Filed |