House | 05/03/2023 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2853 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 1401 | Journal Page: 2853 |
House | 05/02/2023 | Postponed | 5/3/23 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 2753 |
House | 05/02/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2753 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2468 | |
House | 04/13/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | Journal Page: 613 | |
House | 03/13/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 613 | |
House | 02/22/2023 | Filed |