Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2702 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/23/2023

                    88R10077 RDS-F
 By: Guillen H.B. No. 2702


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to payments associated with certain medical examinations
 under the workers' compensation system; imposing a fee.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 408.0041(h), Labor Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (h)  In accordance with the adjusted payment amounts
 prescribed by the commissioner under Section 408.00411, the [The]
 insurance carrier shall pay [for]:
 (1)  for:
 (A)  an examination required under Subsection
 (a), (f), or (f-2), unless otherwise prohibited by this subtitle or
 by an order or rule of the commissioner; and
 (B) [(2)]  the reasonable expenses incident to
 the employee in submitting to the examination; or
 (2)  if an employee fails or refuses to appear at the
 time and place scheduled for an examination under Subsection (a) or
 (f), a fee set by the commissioner in an amount not less than $100,
 to the designated doctor or doctor selected by the insurance
 carrier, as applicable.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter A, Chapter 408, Labor Code, is
 amended by adding Section 408.00411 to read as follows:
 Sec. 408.00411.  ADJUSTMENT OF CERTAIN EXAMINATION FEES AND
 EXAMINATION NO-SHOW FEES. (a)  Not later than January 31 of each
 even-numbered year beginning 2026, the commissioner shall adjust
 for inflation in accordance with Subsection (b) the amounts
 required to be paid by an insurance carrier:
 (1)  for a medical examination under Section
 408.0041(a), (f), or (f-2); and
 (2)  as a fee under Section 408.0041(h)(2) for the
 failure or refusal of an employee to appear at the time and place
 scheduled for a medical examination to which that subdivision
 applies.
 (b)  The commissioner shall compute the amount of an
 adjustment under Subsection (a) based on the percentage increase,
 if any, in the Medicare Economic Index for the preceding 24-month
 period ending January 1.
 (c)  An adjustment under this section takes effect beginning
 March 1 of the year of the adjustment.
 (d)  Not later than January 31, 2024, the commissioner shall
 adjust for inflation in accordance with this subsection the amounts
 required to be paid by an insurance carrier for a medical
 examination under Section 408.0041(a), (f), or (f-2).  The
 commissioner shall compute the amount of the adjustment based on
 the percentage increase, if any, in the Medicare Economic Index for
 the period beginning on the date that the fee was last set or
 adjusted by the commissioner and ending January 1, 2024.  This
 subsection expires January 1, 2025.
 SECTION 3.  Not later than January 31, 2024, the
 commissioner of workers' compensation shall set the initial amount
 of the fee under Section 408.0041(h)(2), Labor Code, as added by
 this Act.
 SECTION 4.  Not later than January 31, 2026, the
 commissioner of workers' compensation shall make the initial
 adjustment to the fee under Section 408.0041(h)(2), Labor Code, as
 added by this Act, in accordance with Section 408.00411, Labor
 Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 5.  The changes in law made by this Act to Section
 408.0041, Labor Code, apply only to a medical examination that
 occurs or is scheduled to occur, as applicable, on or after March 1,
 2024. A medical examination that occurs or is scheduled to occur,
 as applicable, before that date is governed by the law as it existed
 immediately before the effective date of this Act, and the former
 law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.