Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2702 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2023
Bill February 23, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 2, 2023
Analysis May 2, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Analysis May 16, 2023
Bill May 11, 2023
Bill May 11, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 22, 2023
Witness List

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2023
Bill May 2, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 16, 2023
Analysis May 2, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 16, 2023
Fiscal Note April 21, 2023
Fiscal Note March 25, 2023