Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2702 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/22/2023

                    By: Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Menéndez) H.B. No. 2702
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 12, 2023;
 May 12, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 21, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 1; May 21, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 SchwertnerX
 KingX
 BirdwellX
 CampbellX
 CreightonX
 JohnsonX
 KolkhorstX
 MenéndezX
 MiddletonX
 NicholsX
 ZaffiriniX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to payments associated with certain medical examinations
 under the workers' compensation system; imposing a fee.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 408.0041(h), Labor Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (h)  In accordance with the adjusted payment amounts
 prescribed by the commissioner under Section 408.00411, the [The]
 insurance carrier shall pay [for]:
 (1)  for:
 (A)  an examination required under Subsection
 (a), (f), or (f-2), unless otherwise prohibited by this subtitle or
 by an order or rule of the commissioner; and
 (B) [(2)]  the reasonable expenses incident to
 the employee in submitting to the examination; or
 (2)  if an employee fails or refuses to appear at the
 time and place scheduled for an examination under Subsection (a) or
 (f) without good cause as determined by the commissioner, a fee set
 by the commissioner in an amount not less than $100 to the
 designated doctor or doctor selected by the insurance carrier, as
 applicable.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter A, Chapter 408, Labor Code, is
 amended by adding Section 408.00411 to read as follows:
 Sec. 408.00411.  ADJUSTMENT OF CERTAIN EXAMINATION FEES AND
 EXAMINATION NO-SHOW FEES.  (a)  Not later than January 31 of each
 year beginning with the year 2025, the commissioner shall adjust
 for inflation, in accordance with rules adopted under Subsection
 (b), the amounts required to be paid by an insurance carrier:
 (1)  for a medical examination conducted under Section
 408.004 or 408.0041(a), (f), or (f-2);
 (2)  for a medical examination conducted to determine
 or resolve any question about:
 (A)  the impairment caused by the compensable
 injury; or
 (B)  the attainment of maximum medical
 improvement; and
 (3)  as a fee under Section 408.0041(h)(2) for the
 failure or refusal of an employee to appear at the time and place
 scheduled for a medical examination to which that subdivision
 applies.
 (b)  Subject to Section 413.011, the commissioner shall
 adopt rules as necessary to implement this section, including rules
 providing for the computation of the amount of an adjustment under
 Subsection (a), which may provide for determining the amount of the
 adjustment using the Medicare Economic Index.
 (c)  Notwithstanding any other provision of this section,
 not later than January 31, 2024, the commissioner shall adjust for
 inflation, in accordance with this subsection, the amounts required
 to be paid by an insurance carrier for a medical examination
 described by Subsection (a)(1) or (2).  The commissioner shall
 compute the amount of the adjustment based on the percentage
 increase, if any, in the Medicare Economic Index for the period
 beginning on the date that the fee was initially adopted or last
 adjusted by the commissioner, as applicable, and ending January 1,
 2024.  This subsection expires January 1, 2025.
 SECTION 3.  Not later than April 1, 2024, the commissioner of
 workers' compensation shall set the initial amount of the fee under
 Section 408.0041(h)(2), Labor Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 4.  Not later than April 1, 2024, the commissioner of
 workers' compensation shall adopt rules to implement Section
 408.00411, Labor Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 5.  The changes in law made by this Act to Section
 408.0041, Labor Code, apply only to a medical examination that
 occurs or is scheduled to occur, as applicable, on or after March 1,
 2024. A medical examination that occurs or is scheduled to occur,
 as applicable, before that date is governed by the law as it existed
 immediately before the effective date of this Act, and the former
 law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *