1 | 1 | | By: Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Menéndez) H.B. No. 2702 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 12, 2023; |
---|
3 | 3 | | May 12, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Business & |
---|
4 | 4 | | Commerce; May 21, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote: |
---|
5 | 5 | | Yeas 9, Nays 1; May 21, 2023, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | 6 | | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | COMMITTEE VOTE |
---|
10 | 10 | | YeaNayAbsentPNV |
---|
11 | 11 | | SchwertnerX |
---|
12 | 12 | | KingX |
---|
13 | 13 | | BirdwellX |
---|
14 | 14 | | CampbellX |
---|
15 | 15 | | CreightonX |
---|
16 | 16 | | JohnsonX |
---|
17 | 17 | | KolkhorstX |
---|
18 | 18 | | MenéndezX |
---|
19 | 19 | | MiddletonX |
---|
20 | 20 | | NicholsX |
---|
21 | 21 | | ZaffiriniX |
---|
22 | 22 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
23 | 23 | | AN ACT |
---|
24 | 24 | | relating to payments associated with certain medical examinations |
---|
25 | 25 | | under the workers' compensation system; imposing a fee. |
---|
26 | 26 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
27 | 27 | | SECTION 1. Section 408.0041(h), Labor Code, is amended to |
---|
28 | 28 | | read as follows: |
---|
29 | 29 | | (h) In accordance with the adjusted payment amounts |
---|
30 | 30 | | prescribed by the commissioner under Section 408.00411, the [The] |
---|
31 | 31 | | insurance carrier shall pay [for]: |
---|
32 | 32 | | (1) for: |
---|
33 | 33 | | (A) an examination required under Subsection |
---|
34 | 34 | | (a), (f), or (f-2), unless otherwise prohibited by this subtitle or |
---|
35 | 35 | | by an order or rule of the commissioner; and |
---|
36 | 36 | | (B) [(2)] the reasonable expenses incident to |
---|
37 | 37 | | the employee in submitting to the examination; or |
---|
38 | 38 | | (2) if an employee fails or refuses to appear at the |
---|
39 | 39 | | time and place scheduled for an examination under Subsection (a) or |
---|
40 | 40 | | (f) without good cause as determined by the commissioner, a fee set |
---|
41 | 41 | | by the commissioner in an amount not less than $100 to the |
---|
42 | 42 | | designated doctor or doctor selected by the insurance carrier, as |
---|
43 | 43 | | applicable. |
---|
44 | 44 | | SECTION 2. Subchapter A, Chapter 408, Labor Code, is |
---|
45 | 45 | | amended by adding Section 408.00411 to read as follows: |
---|
46 | 46 | | Sec. 408.00411. ADJUSTMENT OF CERTAIN EXAMINATION FEES AND |
---|
47 | 47 | | EXAMINATION NO-SHOW FEES. (a) Not later than January 31 of each |
---|
48 | 48 | | year beginning with the year 2025, the commissioner shall adjust |
---|
49 | 49 | | for inflation, in accordance with rules adopted under Subsection |
---|
50 | 50 | | (b), the amounts required to be paid by an insurance carrier: |
---|
51 | 51 | | (1) for a medical examination conducted under Section |
---|
52 | 52 | | 408.004 or 408.0041(a), (f), or (f-2); |
---|
53 | 53 | | (2) for a medical examination conducted to determine |
---|
54 | 54 | | or resolve any question about: |
---|
55 | 55 | | (A) the impairment caused by the compensable |
---|
56 | 56 | | injury; or |
---|
57 | 57 | | (B) the attainment of maximum medical |
---|
58 | 58 | | improvement; and |
---|
59 | 59 | | (3) as a fee under Section 408.0041(h)(2) for the |
---|
60 | 60 | | failure or refusal of an employee to appear at the time and place |
---|
61 | 61 | | scheduled for a medical examination to which that subdivision |
---|
62 | 62 | | applies. |
---|
63 | 63 | | (b) Subject to Section 413.011, the commissioner shall |
---|
64 | 64 | | adopt rules as necessary to implement this section, including rules |
---|
65 | 65 | | providing for the computation of the amount of an adjustment under |
---|
66 | 66 | | Subsection (a), which may provide for determining the amount of the |
---|
67 | 67 | | adjustment using the Medicare Economic Index. |
---|
68 | 68 | | (c) Notwithstanding any other provision of this section, |
---|
69 | 69 | | not later than January 31, 2024, the commissioner shall adjust for |
---|
70 | 70 | | inflation, in accordance with this subsection, the amounts required |
---|
71 | 71 | | to be paid by an insurance carrier for a medical examination |
---|
72 | 72 | | described by Subsection (a)(1) or (2). The commissioner shall |
---|
73 | 73 | | compute the amount of the adjustment based on the percentage |
---|
74 | 74 | | increase, if any, in the Medicare Economic Index for the period |
---|
75 | 75 | | beginning on the date that the fee was initially adopted or last |
---|
76 | 76 | | adjusted by the commissioner, as applicable, and ending January 1, |
---|
77 | 77 | | 2024. This subsection expires January 1, 2025. |
---|
78 | 78 | | SECTION 3. Not later than April 1, 2024, the commissioner of |
---|
79 | 79 | | workers' compensation shall set the initial amount of the fee under |
---|
80 | 80 | | Section 408.0041(h)(2), Labor Code, as added by this Act. |
---|
81 | 81 | | SECTION 4. Not later than April 1, 2024, the commissioner of |
---|
82 | 82 | | workers' compensation shall adopt rules to implement Section |
---|
83 | 83 | | 408.00411, Labor Code, as added by this Act. |
---|
84 | 84 | | SECTION 5. The changes in law made by this Act to Section |
---|
85 | 85 | | 408.0041, Labor Code, apply only to a medical examination that |
---|
86 | 86 | | occurs or is scheduled to occur, as applicable, on or after March 1, |
---|
87 | 87 | | 2024. A medical examination that occurs or is scheduled to occur, |
---|
88 | 88 | | as applicable, before that date is governed by the law as it existed |
---|
89 | 89 | | immediately before the effective date of this Act, and the former |
---|
90 | 90 | | law is continued in effect for that purpose. |
---|
91 | 91 | | SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2023. |
---|
92 | 92 | | * * * * * |
---|