Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3040
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3040
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3040
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5875
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5875
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5875
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5291
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2585
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2585
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2585
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2585
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2585
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2585
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2585
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Huffman
|
Journal Page: 2583
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2583
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2583
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2682
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2326
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2058
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 1959
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1959
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1703
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3860
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3530
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1310
|
Journal Page: 3529
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3529
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3529
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3384
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1265
|
Journal Page: 3383
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3383
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Amended
|
5-Dean and Spiller
|
Journal Page: 3383
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Amended 5-Dean and Spiller
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Amended 4-T. King
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Amended 3-Shaheen
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3381
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Postponed
|
5/8/23 8:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 3336
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3336
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2578
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1959
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 622
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|