1 | 1 | | By: Leach (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) H.B. No. 2779 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2023; |
---|
3 | 3 | | May 16, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Finance; |
---|
4 | 4 | | May 21, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable Committee |
---|
5 | 5 | | Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 16, Nays 0; May 21, 2023, |
---|
6 | 6 | | sent to printer.) |
---|
7 | 7 | | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
8 | 8 | | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2779 By: Huffman |
---|
9 | 9 | | |
---|
10 | 10 | | |
---|
11 | 11 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
12 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
13 | 13 | | relating to the compensation and retirement benefits of certain |
---|
14 | 14 | | elected state officials. |
---|
15 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
16 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Section 659.012(b), Government Code, is amended |
---|
17 | 17 | | to read as follows: |
---|
18 | 18 | | (b) A judge or justice for whom the amount of a state base |
---|
19 | 19 | | salary is prescribed by Subsection (a) is entitled to an annual |
---|
20 | 20 | | salary from the state in the amount equal to: |
---|
21 | 21 | | (1) 110 percent of the state base salary paid in |
---|
22 | 22 | | accordance with Subsection (a) for the judge's or justice's |
---|
23 | 23 | | position, beginning with the pay period that begins after the judge |
---|
24 | 24 | | or justice accrues four years of: |
---|
25 | 25 | | (A) contributing service credit in the Judicial |
---|
26 | 26 | | Retirement System of Texas Plan One or the Judicial Retirement |
---|
27 | 27 | | System of Texas Plan Two; |
---|
28 | 28 | | (B) service as a judge of a statutory county |
---|
29 | 29 | | court, multicounty statutory county court, or statutory probate |
---|
30 | 30 | | court; or |
---|
31 | 31 | | (C) combined contributing service credit and |
---|
32 | 32 | | service as provided by Paragraphs (A) and (B); [and] |
---|
33 | 33 | | (2) 120 percent of the state base salary paid in |
---|
34 | 34 | | accordance with Subsection (a) for the judge's or justice's |
---|
35 | 35 | | position, beginning with the pay period that begins after the judge |
---|
36 | 36 | | or justice accrues eight years of: |
---|
37 | 37 | | (A) contributing service credit in the Judicial |
---|
38 | 38 | | Retirement System of Texas Plan One or the Judicial Retirement |
---|
39 | 39 | | System of Texas Plan Two; |
---|
40 | 40 | | (B) service as a judge of a statutory county |
---|
41 | 41 | | court, multicounty statutory county court, or statutory probate |
---|
42 | 42 | | court; or |
---|
43 | 43 | | (C) combined contributing service credit and |
---|
44 | 44 | | service as provided by Paragraphs (A) and (B); and |
---|
45 | 45 | | (3) 130 percent of the state base salary paid in |
---|
46 | 46 | | accordance with Subsection (a) for the judge's or justice's |
---|
47 | 47 | | position, beginning with the pay period that begins after the judge |
---|
48 | 48 | | or justice accrues 12 years of: |
---|
49 | 49 | | (A) contributing service credit in the Judicial |
---|
50 | 50 | | Retirement System of Texas Plan One or the Judicial Retirement |
---|
51 | 51 | | System of Texas Plan Two; |
---|
52 | 52 | | (B) service as a judge of a statutory county |
---|
53 | 53 | | court, multicounty statutory county court, or statutory probate |
---|
54 | 54 | | court; or |
---|
55 | 55 | | (C) combined contributing service credit and |
---|
56 | 56 | | service as provided by Paragraphs (A) and (B). |
---|
57 | 57 | | SECTION 2. Section 659.0445(b), Government Code, is amended |
---|
58 | 58 | | to read as follows: |
---|
59 | 59 | | (b) The monthly amount of longevity pay under this section |
---|
60 | 60 | | to which a judge or justice described by Subsection (a) is entitled: |
---|
61 | 61 | | (1) is equal to the product of 0.05 multiplied by the |
---|
62 | 62 | | amount of the judge's or justice's current monthly state salary; and |
---|
63 | 63 | | (2) becomes payable beginning with the month following |
---|
64 | 64 | | the month in which the judge or justice completes 14 [12] years of |
---|
65 | 65 | | service for which credit is established in the applicable |
---|
66 | 66 | | retirement system. |
---|
67 | 67 | | SECTION 3. Sections 814.103(a) and (a-1), Government Code, |
---|
68 | 68 | | are amended to read as follows: |
---|
69 | 69 | | (a) Except as provided by Subsection (a-1) or (b), the |
---|
70 | 70 | | standard service retirement annuity for service credited in the |
---|
71 | 71 | | elected class of membership is an amount equal to the number of |
---|
72 | 72 | | years of service credit in that class, times 2.3 percent of the |
---|
73 | 73 | | state base salary, excluding longevity pay payable under Section |
---|
74 | 74 | | 659.0445 [and as adjusted from time to time], being paid to a |
---|
75 | 75 | | district judge as set by the General Appropriations Act in |
---|
76 | 76 | | accordance with Section 659.012(a). |
---|
77 | 77 | | (a-1) Except as provided by Subsection (b), the standard |
---|
78 | 78 | | service retirement annuity for service credited in the elected |
---|
79 | 79 | | class of membership for a member of the class under Section |
---|
80 | 80 | | 812.002(a)(3) whose effective date of retirement is on or after |
---|
81 | 81 | | September 1, 2019, is an amount equal to the number of years of |
---|
82 | 82 | | service credit in that class, times 2.3 percent of the state salary, |
---|
83 | 83 | | excluding longevity pay payable under Section 659.0445 [and as |
---|
84 | 84 | | adjusted from time to time], being paid in accordance with Section |
---|
85 | 85 | | 659.012 to a district judge who has the same number of years of |
---|
86 | 86 | | contributing service credit as the member on the member's last day |
---|
87 | 87 | | of service as a district or criminal district attorney, as |
---|
88 | 88 | | applicable. |
---|
89 | 89 | | SECTION 4. Section 834.102(a), Government Code, is amended |
---|
90 | 90 | | to read as follows: |
---|
91 | 91 | | (a) The base service retirement annuity for a person whose |
---|
92 | 92 | | effective date of retirement is: |
---|
93 | 93 | | (1) before September 1, 2019, is an amount equal to 50 |
---|
94 | 94 | | percent of the state base salary[, as adjusted from time to time,] |
---|
95 | 95 | | being paid in accordance with Section 659.012(a) to a judge of a |
---|
96 | 96 | | court of the same classification as the court on which the retiree |
---|
97 | 97 | | last served before retirement; or |
---|
98 | 98 | | (2) on or after September 1, 2019, is an amount equal |
---|
99 | 99 | | to 50 percent of the state salary[, as adjusted from time to time,] |
---|
100 | 100 | | being paid in accordance with Section 659.012(b)(2) to a judge of a |
---|
101 | 101 | | court of the same classification as the court on which the retiree |
---|
102 | 102 | | last served before retirement. |
---|
103 | 103 | | SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2023. |
---|
104 | 104 | | * * * * * |
---|