Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2873 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2023
Bill February 27, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Analysis April 20, 2023
Bill April 13, 2023

Engrossed

Analysis May 16, 2023
Bill May 2, 2023
Bill May 2, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 19, 2023
Witness List

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2023
Bill April 13, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 16, 2023
Fiscal Note March 27, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 16, 2023
Analysis April 13, 2023