Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2883 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
03/28/2023 2:00 pm
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/04/2023 S Referred to Transportation
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2023 S Referred to State Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2023 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/09/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Introduced
Last Action: 03/28/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 03/28/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 03/28/2023 H Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 03/28/2023 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/12/2023 S Referred to Criminal Justice