Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2934 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2023
Bill February 27, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 28, 2023
Analysis April 27, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Comm Sub

Bill April 28, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 27, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 20, 2023
Fiscal Note April 11, 2023