Senate | 05/08/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Referred to Local Government | Journal Page: 966 | |
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 966 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 917 | |
House | 04/12/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1448 | |
House | 04/12/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1354 | |
House | 04/12/2023 | Record vote | RV#155 | Journal Page: 1353 |
House | 04/12/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1353 | |
House | 04/12/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1353 | |
House | 04/11/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1332 | |
House | 04/11/2023 | Record vote | RV#145 | Journal Page: 1331 |
House | 04/11/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1331 | |
House | 04/11/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1331 | |
House | 04/11/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1048 | |
House | 03/28/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 966 | |
House | 03/14/2023 | Referred to Land & Resource Management | Journal Page: 646 | |
House | 02/28/2023 | Filed |