House | 05/11/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1793 | |
House | 04/13/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 647 | |
House | 03/14/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 647 | |
House | 02/28/2023 | Filed |