E
|
05/27/2023
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/27/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6429
|
E
|
05/16/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4564
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1918
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4313
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4387
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4217
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1836
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1836
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1836
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1836
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1836
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1836
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1836
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1696
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1234
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1234
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1201
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1842
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1735
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#345
|
Journal Page: 1735
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1735
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1735
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1725
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1725
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Recommendations filed with the Speaker
|
|
Journal Page: 1449
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1344
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1234
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 649
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|