Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3108 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 1, 2023
Bill March 1, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 4, 2023
Analysis April 4, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Analysis April 21, 2023
Bill April 14, 2023
Bill April 14, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 26, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 4, 2023
Bill May 4, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 26, 2023
Bill April 4, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 21, 2023
Analysis April 4, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 20, 2023
Fiscal Note March 18, 2023