Senate | 05/15/2023 | Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 1921 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1921 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1866 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4317 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4155 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Record vote | RV#1630 | Journal Page: 4155 |
House | 05/12/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 4155 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4155 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4023 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Record vote | RV#1568 | Journal Page: 4022 |
House | 05/11/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 4022 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4022 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1793 | |
House | 04/04/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1921 | |
House | 03/14/2023 | Referred to Environmental Regulation | Journal Page: 659 | |
House | 03/01/2023 | Filed |