Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB314 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
03/07/2023 10:30 am
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/13/2023 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/12/2023 S Received from the House
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 03/07/2023 H No action taken in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/11/2023 H Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/03/2023 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/06/2023 S Received from the House
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Postponed
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2023 S Received from the House
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/26/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective immediately
Introduced
Last Action: 03/07/2023 H No action taken in committee