1 | 1 | | By: Lopez of Bexar H.B. No. 321 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
5 | 5 | | AN ACT |
---|
6 | 6 | | relating to authorizing the increase or decrease of the rates of the |
---|
7 | 7 | | gasoline and diesel fuel taxes based on the cost of certain highway |
---|
8 | 8 | | projects. |
---|
9 | 9 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
10 | 10 | | SECTION 1. (a) Subchapter B, Chapter 162, Tax Code, is |
---|
11 | 11 | | amended by adding Section 162.1021 to read as follows: |
---|
12 | 12 | | Sec. 162.1021. ANNUAL RATE CHANGE ACCORDING TO HIGHWAY COST |
---|
13 | 13 | | INDEX. (a) In this section: |
---|
14 | 14 | | (1) "Highway cost index" means the 12-month moving |
---|
15 | 15 | | average of the price of materials and labor compiled by the Texas |
---|
16 | 16 | | Department of Transportation and incorporated into state highway |
---|
17 | 17 | | projects. |
---|
18 | 18 | | (2) "Highway cost index percentage change" means the |
---|
19 | 19 | | percentage increase or decrease in the highway cost index of a given |
---|
20 | 20 | | state fiscal year from the highway cost index of the preceding state |
---|
21 | 21 | | fiscal year. |
---|
22 | 22 | | (b) Notwithstanding Section 162.102, on January 1 of each |
---|
23 | 23 | | year, the rate of the gasoline tax imposed under this subchapter is |
---|
24 | 24 | | increased or decreased by a percentage equal to the highway cost |
---|
25 | 25 | | index percentage change for the preceding state fiscal year. |
---|
26 | 26 | | (c) Not later than December 1 of each year, the comptroller |
---|
27 | 27 | | shall: |
---|
28 | 28 | | (1) compute the new tax rate as provided by this |
---|
29 | 29 | | section; |
---|
30 | 30 | | (2) give the new tax rate to the secretary of state for |
---|
31 | 31 | | publication in the Texas Register; and |
---|
32 | 32 | | (3) notify each license holder under this subchapter |
---|
33 | 33 | | of the applicable new tax rate. |
---|
34 | 34 | | (b) The comptroller shall compute the initial adjusted tax |
---|
35 | 35 | | rate as required by Section 162.1021(c), Tax Code, as added by this |
---|
36 | 36 | | section, not later than December 1, 2019. The initial adjusted rate |
---|
37 | 37 | | takes effect January 1, 2020. |
---|
38 | 38 | | SECTION 2. Effective January 1, 2020, Section 162.103(a), |
---|
39 | 39 | | Tax Code, is amended to read as follows: |
---|
40 | 40 | | (a) A backup tax is imposed at the rate prescribed by |
---|
41 | 41 | | Section 162.102 or 162.1021 on: |
---|
42 | 42 | | (1) a person who obtains a refund of tax on gasoline by |
---|
43 | 43 | | claiming the gasoline was used for an off-highway purpose, but |
---|
44 | 44 | | actually uses the gasoline to operate a motor vehicle on a public |
---|
45 | 45 | | highway; |
---|
46 | 46 | | (2) a person who operates a motor vehicle on a public |
---|
47 | 47 | | highway using gasoline on which tax has not been paid; |
---|
48 | 48 | | (3) a person who sells to the ultimate consumer |
---|
49 | 49 | | gasoline on which tax has not been paid and who knew or had reason to |
---|
50 | 50 | | know that the gasoline would be used for a taxable purpose; and |
---|
51 | 51 | | (4) a person, other than a person exempted under |
---|
52 | 52 | | Section 162.104, who acquires gasoline on which tax has not been |
---|
53 | 53 | | paid from any source in this state. |
---|
54 | 54 | | SECTION 3. (a) Subchapter C, Chapter 162, Tax Code, is |
---|
55 | 55 | | amended by adding Section 162.2021 to read as follows: |
---|
56 | 56 | | Sec. 162.2021. ANNUAL RATE CHANGE ACCORDING TO HIGHWAY COST |
---|
57 | 57 | | INDEX. (a) In this section: |
---|
58 | 58 | | (1) "Highway cost index" means the 12-month moving |
---|
59 | 59 | | average of the price of materials and labor compiled by the Texas |
---|
60 | 60 | | Department of Transportation and incorporated into state highway |
---|
61 | 61 | | projects. |
---|
62 | 62 | | (2) "Highway cost index percentage change" means the |
---|
63 | 63 | | percentage increase or decrease in the highway cost index of a given |
---|
64 | 64 | | state fiscal year from the highway cost index of the preceding state |
---|
65 | 65 | | fiscal year. |
---|
66 | 66 | | (b) Notwithstanding Section 162.202, on January 1 of each |
---|
67 | 67 | | year, the rate of the diesel fuel tax imposed under this subchapter |
---|
68 | 68 | | is increased or decreased by a percentage equal to the highway cost |
---|
69 | 69 | | index percentage change for the preceding state fiscal year. |
---|
70 | 70 | | (c) Not later than December 1 of each year, the comptroller |
---|
71 | 71 | | shall: |
---|
72 | 72 | | (1) compute the new tax rate as provided by this |
---|
73 | 73 | | section; |
---|
74 | 74 | | (2) give the new tax rate to the secretary of state for |
---|
75 | 75 | | publication in the Texas Register; and |
---|
76 | 76 | | (3) notify each license holder under this subchapter |
---|
77 | 77 | | of the applicable new tax rate. |
---|
78 | 78 | | (b) The comptroller shall compute the initial adjusted tax |
---|
79 | 79 | | rate as required by Section 162.2021(c), Tax Code, as added by this |
---|
80 | 80 | | section, not later than December 1, 2023. The initial adjusted rate |
---|
81 | 81 | | takes effect January 1, 2024. |
---|
82 | 82 | | SECTION 4. Effective January 1, 2024, Section 162.203(a), |
---|
83 | 83 | | Tax Code, is amended to read as follows: |
---|
84 | 84 | | (a) A backup tax is imposed at the rate prescribed by |
---|
85 | 85 | | Section 162.202 or 162.2021 on: |
---|
86 | 86 | | (1) a person who obtains a refund of tax on diesel fuel |
---|
87 | 87 | | by claiming the diesel fuel was used for an off-highway purpose, but |
---|
88 | 88 | | actually uses the diesel fuel to operate a motor vehicle on a public |
---|
89 | 89 | | highway; |
---|
90 | 90 | | (2) a person who operates a motor vehicle on a public |
---|
91 | 91 | | highway using diesel fuel on which tax has not been paid; |
---|
92 | 92 | | (3) a person who sells to the ultimate consumer diesel |
---|
93 | 93 | | fuel on which a tax has not been paid and who knew or had reason to |
---|
94 | 94 | | know that the diesel fuel would be used for a taxable purpose; and |
---|
95 | 95 | | (4) a person, other than a person exempted under |
---|
96 | 96 | | Section 162.204, who acquires diesel fuel on which tax has not been |
---|
97 | 97 | | paid from any source in this state. |
---|
98 | 98 | | SECTION 5. Except as otherwise provided by this Act, this |
---|
99 | 99 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2023. |
---|