Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB321 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 11/17/2022

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Lopez of Bexar H.B. No. 321


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to authorizing the increase or decrease of the rates of the
 gasoline and diesel fuel taxes based on the cost of certain highway
 projects.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a) Subchapter B, Chapter 162, Tax Code, is
 amended by adding Section 162.1021 to read as follows:
 Sec. 162.1021.  ANNUAL RATE CHANGE ACCORDING TO HIGHWAY COST
 INDEX. (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Highway cost index" means the 12-month moving
 average of the price of materials and labor compiled by the Texas
 Department of Transportation and incorporated into state highway
 projects.
 (2)  "Highway cost index percentage change" means the
 percentage increase or decrease in the highway cost index of a given
 state fiscal year from the highway cost index of the preceding state
 fiscal year.
 (b)  Notwithstanding Section 162.102, on January 1 of each
 year, the rate of the gasoline tax imposed under this subchapter is
 increased or decreased by a percentage equal to the highway cost
 index percentage change for the preceding state fiscal year.
 (c)  Not later than December 1 of each year, the comptroller
 shall:
 (1)  compute the new tax rate as provided by this
 section;
 (2)  give the new tax rate to the secretary of state for
 publication in the Texas Register; and
 (3)  notify each license holder under this subchapter
 of the applicable new tax rate.
 (b)  The comptroller shall compute the initial adjusted tax
 rate as required by Section 162.1021(c), Tax Code, as added by this
 section, not later than December 1, 2019. The initial adjusted rate
 takes effect January 1, 2020.
 SECTION 2.  Effective January 1, 2020, Section 162.103(a),
 Tax Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A backup tax is imposed at the rate prescribed by
 Section 162.102 or 162.1021 on:
 (1)  a person who obtains a refund of tax on gasoline by
 claiming the gasoline was used for an off-highway purpose, but
 actually uses the gasoline to operate a motor vehicle on a public
 highway;
 (2)  a person who operates a motor vehicle on a public
 highway using gasoline on which tax has not been paid;
 (3)  a person who sells to the ultimate consumer
 gasoline on which tax has not been paid and who knew or had reason to
 know that the gasoline would be used for a taxable purpose; and
 (4)  a person, other than a person exempted under
 Section 162.104, who acquires gasoline on which tax has not been
 paid from any source in this state.
 SECTION 3.  (a) Subchapter C, Chapter 162, Tax Code, is
 amended by adding Section 162.2021 to read as follows:
 Sec. 162.2021.  ANNUAL RATE CHANGE ACCORDING TO HIGHWAY COST
 INDEX. (a) In this section:
 (1)  "Highway cost index" means the 12-month moving
 average of the price of materials and labor compiled by the Texas
 Department of Transportation and incorporated into state highway
 projects.
 (2)  "Highway cost index percentage change" means the
 percentage increase or decrease in the highway cost index of a given
 state fiscal year from the highway cost index of the preceding state
 fiscal year.
 (b)  Notwithstanding Section 162.202, on January 1 of each
 year, the rate of the diesel fuel tax imposed under this subchapter
 is increased or decreased by a percentage equal to the highway cost
 index percentage change for the preceding state fiscal year.
 (c)  Not later than December 1 of each year, the comptroller
 shall:
 (1)  compute the new tax rate as provided by this
 section;
 (2)  give the new tax rate to the secretary of state for
 publication in the Texas Register; and
 (3)  notify each license holder under this subchapter
 of the applicable new tax rate.
 (b)  The comptroller shall compute the initial adjusted tax
 rate as required by Section 162.2021(c), Tax Code, as added by this
 section, not later than December 1, 2023. The initial adjusted rate
 takes effect January 1, 2024.
 SECTION 4.  Effective January 1, 2024, Section 162.203(a),
 Tax Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A backup tax is imposed at the rate prescribed by
 Section 162.202 or 162.2021 on:
 (1)  a person who obtains a refund of tax on diesel fuel
 by claiming the diesel fuel was used for an off-highway purpose, but
 actually uses the diesel fuel to operate a motor vehicle on a public
 highway;
 (2)  a person who operates a motor vehicle on a public
 highway using diesel fuel on which tax has not been paid;
 (3)  a person who sells to the ultimate consumer diesel
 fuel on which a tax has not been paid and who knew or had reason to
 know that the diesel fuel would be used for a taxable purpose; and
 (4)  a person, other than a person exempted under
 Section 162.204, who acquires diesel fuel on which tax has not been
 paid from any source in this state.
 SECTION 5.  Except as otherwise provided by this Act, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.