Senate | 05/12/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1820 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4221 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3885 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Record vote | RV#1502 | Journal Page: 3885 |
House | 05/11/2023 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 3885 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Amended | 1-Gmez | Journal Page: 3885 |
House | 05/11/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3884 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3808 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Record vote | RV#1461 | Journal Page: 3807 |
House | 05/10/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3807 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Amended | 1-Cortez | Journal Page: 3807 |
House | 05/10/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3807 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2468 | |
House | 04/21/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/21/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/21/2023 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 314 | |
House | 02/23/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 314 | |
House | 11/14/2022 | Filed |