Senate | 05/09/2023 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 1691 | |
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1691 | |
Senate | 05/05/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1605 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3211 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2975 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Record vote | RV#1040 | Journal Page: 2974 |
House | 05/04/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 2974 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2974 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2897 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Amended | 1-Hull | Journal Page: 2896 |
House | 05/03/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2896 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1709 | |
House | 04/13/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1691 | |
House | 03/15/2023 | Referred to Youth Health & Safety, Select | Journal Page: 677 | |
House | 03/02/2023 | Filed |