E
|
06/12/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
06/12/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6491
|
E
|
05/30/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6489
|
Senate
|
05/29/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3303
|
House
|
05/28/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6422
|
House
|
05/27/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6428
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2955
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5527
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5528
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#2127
|
Journal Page: 5527
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5527
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#2127
|
Journal Page: 5527
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5137
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2450
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2450
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2450
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2450
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2450
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2450
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Alvarado
|
Journal Page: 2449
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2449
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1 Alvarado
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2449
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2138
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1691
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1691
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1622
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3469
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3258
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3253
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1176
|
Journal Page: 3258
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3258
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Record vote RV#1176
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3258
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3231
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3231
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2048
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1691
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 678
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|